User contributions
From SamuraiWiki
Jump to navigationJump to search- 02:03, 11 March 2020 diff hist 0 Shimazu Nariakira
- 21:33, 10 March 2020 diff hist +3 Shimoda bugyo →Partial List of Shimoda bugyô
- 21:33, 10 March 2020 diff hist +167 Isawa Masayoshi
- 21:31, 10 March 2020 diff hist +39 Kanjo bugyo →Selected Kanjô Bugyô
- 21:31, 10 March 2020 diff hist +3 Kanjo bugyo →Selected Kanjô Bugyô
- 21:31, 10 March 2020 diff hist +7 Kanjo bugyo →Selected Kanjô Bugyô
- 21:16, 10 March 2020 diff hist -7 Kanjo bugyo →Selected Kanjô Bugyô
- 21:15, 10 March 2020 diff hist +60 Kawaji Toshiakira
- 22:50, 9 March 2020 diff hist +512 Nakagusuku udun
- 19:34, 9 March 2020 diff hist +2,051 Ie udun →Lineage chart
- 09:26, 9 March 2020 diff hist -2,758 Ie udun →Lineage chart
- 09:11, 9 March 2020 diff hist +4,934 Ie udun →Lineage chart
- 07:30, 9 March 2020 diff hist +10 Roju →Selected List of Rôjû
- 07:11, 9 March 2020 diff hist +460 N Hashimoto Sanai Created page with "*''Born: 1834'' *''Died: 1859'' *''Other Names'': 綱紀 ''(Kôki)'' *''Japanese'': 橋本 左内 ''(Hashimoto Sanai)'' Hashimoto Sanai was a Fukui han court ..."
- 06:29, 9 March 2020 diff hist +204 Katsu Kaishu
- 05:45, 9 March 2020 diff hist +170 1855 →Births and Deaths
- 05:23, 9 March 2020 diff hist +1,441 N Jan Hendrik Donker Curtius Created page with " Jan Hendrik Donker Curtius was Dutch East India Company factor (''opperhoofd'') at the Dutch base on Dejima in the mid-1850s. He served as interpreter, mediator, and ..."
- 05:00, 9 March 2020 diff hist +436 N Junsei-maru Created page with "*''Sank: 1855/7/26'' *''Japanese'': 順勢丸 ''(Junsei maru)'' The ''Junsei-maru'' was a cargo ship employed by Nabeshima Narimasa to carry cannon produced for the [..." current
- 15:41, 8 March 2020 diff hist -16 伊江 (Ie) current
- 15:41, 8 March 2020 diff hist +2 Oroku Ryokyo current
- 15:40, 8 March 2020 diff hist +60 伊江 (Ie)
- 15:38, 8 March 2020 diff hist +14 Ie udun →References
- 15:38, 8 March 2020 diff hist +3,807 N Ie udun Created page with "*''Japanese'': 伊江 御殿 家 ''(Ie udun ke)'' The Ie udun lineage was a lineage of Ryukyuan [[Scholar-aristocracy of Ryukyu|scholar-aristocr..."
- 14:54, 8 March 2020 diff hist +9 Ie Chochoku
- 07:45, 8 March 2020 diff hist 0 File:Nodake-udun.jpg LordAmeth uploaded a new version of "File:Nodake-udun.jpg" current
- 07:42, 8 March 2020 diff hist +91 Sho Shoko current
- 07:41, 8 March 2020 diff hist +97 N File:Nodake-udun.jpg Nodake udun (Sho Shoko), mother of Sho Sho, in a 1918 photo. Naha City Museum of History.
- 07:26, 8 March 2020 diff hist +203 User:LordAmeth/Notes
- 22:47, 7 March 2020 diff hist +40 Shuri current
- 22:44, 7 March 2020 diff hist +97 N File:Shuri-model.jpg A model of the city of Shuri. At Shuri castle. Photo by User:LordAmeth, 26 Jan 2020. current
- 07:21, 6 March 2020 diff hist +377 N Sibylle create disambig page current
- 07:17, 6 March 2020 diff hist +3 Nicolas Francois Guerin
- 06:49, 6 March 2020 diff hist +55 1855 →Other Events of 1855
- 06:48, 6 March 2020 diff hist +22 Tanshoen
- 06:01, 6 March 2020 diff hist +119 Maeda Nariyasu
- 06:00, 6 March 2020 diff hist +79 1855 →Births and Deaths
- 05:59, 6 March 2020 diff hist +8 Daishoji han →Selected List of Lords current
- 05:59, 6 March 2020 diff hist +60 Daishoji han →Selected List of Lords
- 05:56, 6 March 2020 diff hist +12 Sendai castle current
- 05:56, 6 March 2020 diff hist +343 Sendai castle
- 05:55, 6 March 2020 diff hist 0 Diana
- 04:28, 6 March 2020 diff hist +320 Diana
- 22:16, 4 March 2020 diff hist +24 James Stirling
- 22:15, 4 March 2020 diff hist +229 James Stirling
- 18:33, 4 March 2020 diff hist +85 Ojima Kannondo current
- 18:32, 4 March 2020 diff hist +105 N File:Ojima-kannondo.jpg The Ojima Kannondo on Ôjima Island, Nanjô City, Okinawa. Photo by User:LordAmeth, 26 Oct 2019. current
- 18:22, 4 March 2020 diff hist +31 Ojima Kannondo
- 18:22, 4 March 2020 diff hist +1,996 N Ojima Kannondo Created page with "*''Japanese'': 奥武島観音堂 ''(Ôjima Kannon dô)'' The Ôjima Kannon-dô is a small Buddhist temple on the island of Ôjima in Nanjô City..."
- 03:56, 4 March 2020 diff hist +2,367 N Nicolas Francois Guerin Created page with " Nicolas Francois Guerin was captain of the French warship ''Virginie'' and Commander-in-Chief of the French Oriental Naval Force. He is known for playing the primary role..."
- 03:50, 4 March 2020 diff hist +111 Sabine current