Search results
- ...yoshi was named ''[[jisha bugyo|jisha bugyô]]'' (Magistrate of Temples and Shrines) for the [[Tokugawa shogunate|shogunate]] in [[1864]].1 KB (185 words) - 07:34, 1 April 2020
- ...firefighters|fire brigades]]. He is known for the Hikan [[Inari]] [[Shinto shrines|Shrine]] he established at [[Senso-ji|Sensô-ji]] in [[1855]], after his wi1 KB (170 words) - 11:20, 30 December 2016
- [[Category:Shrines]]2 KB (397 words) - 10:16, 12 June 2012
- ...from the responsibility of the ''[[jisha bugyo|jisha bugyô]]'' (temples & shrines magistrate) to that of the ''[[machi bugyo|machi bugyô]]'' (town magistrat1 KB (150 words) - 17:21, 3 November 2013
- ...within the grounds of [[Edo castle]], the following year. Further Tôshôgû shrines were established at [[Owari han|Nagoya]] in [[1619]] and [[Mito han|Mito]] ...a [[Buddhist temple]].<ref name=unesco>"[http://whc.unesco.org/en/list/913 Shrines and Temples of Nikko]." UNESCO World Heritage Sites official webpage. UNESC6 KB (939 words) - 04:05, 10 May 2023
- [[Category:Shrines]]1 KB (219 words) - 00:32, 2 February 2020
- ...aveling performers were nominally closely associated with [[Shinto shrines|shrines]]; it is possible that Okuni was considered a ''miko'' and/or associated wi4 KB (604 words) - 22:17, 3 January 2014
- ...nds for tourism initiatives and for repairs and maintenance of temples and shrines, as well as for railroad links.1 KB (209 words) - 07:19, 6 June 2020
- [[Category:Shrines]]2 KB (315 words) - 02:25, 17 November 2015
- [[Category:Shrines]]2 KB (242 words) - 02:41, 29 September 2017
- ...he would actively visit the various historical sites and ancient temples & shrines in Nara.1 KB (214 words) - 21:42, 15 September 2019
- ...]]'') in the prefecture and one of the [[Ryukyu Eight Shrines|Ryûkyû Eight Shrines]]. It sits atop a high bluff, overlooking Naminoue Beach and the ocean. ...se]].</ref>, and later was incorporated into the Japanese system of Shinto shrines.7 KB (1,080 words) - 07:42, 14 June 2022
- ...gyô]]'' (Town Magistrate), ''[[Jisha bugyo|jisha bugyô]]'' (Magistrates of Shrines and Temples), ''kujikata [[Kanjo bugyo|kanjô bugyô]]'' (Magistrate of Jud2 KB (251 words) - 12:43, 11 August 2014
- ...[[1848]], he was in the 1st month of that year named apprentice Temples & Shrines Magistrate (''[[Jisha bugyo|Jisha bugyô]] minarai''), and then promoted to1 KB (208 words) - 22:40, 13 July 2020
- ...r the ''Seiden'' (main audience hall) of [[Shuri castle]], and for various shrines and temples.2 KB (245 words) - 15:52, 18 August 2013
- ..., [[Sanjusangendo|Sanjûsangendô]], and thirteen other daimyô, temples, and shrines. The documents sent by Shogun [[Ashikaga Yoshinori]] refer to the shogun as1 KB (199 words) - 23:59, 3 February 2020
- ...gdom's activities, including public works, the construction of temples and shrines, [[tribute]] relations with China, trade with other countries, and sending1 KB (235 words) - 16:54, 24 November 2015
- ...to represent Benten in the [[Kamakura Seven Lucky Gods]] - a collection of shrines and temples each of which represents one of the [[Seven Lucky Gods]]. ...asure house are a set of three late 16th century ''[[mikoshi]]'' (portable shrines).8 KB (1,198 words) - 18:43, 21 November 2015
- ...awa Ieyasu]] and [[Tokugawa Hidetada]]. He founded a number of temples and shrines, including [[Kan'ei-ji]] and the [[Kiyomizu Kannondo|Kiyomizu Kannon-dô]]1 KB (211 words) - 00:54, 8 December 2021
- ...even sites included four [[Buddhist temples|temples]] and [[Shinto shrines|shrines]] (13 buildings); five castles and palaces; and two other stone structures.4 KB (563 words) - 04:45, 31 December 2019