User contributions
From SamuraiWiki
Jump to navigationJump to search- 01:22, 22 July 2021 diff hist +31 N Hozui-maru LordAmeth moved page Hozui-maru to Hozui-maru (1856): disamibg Tag: New redirect
- 01:22, 22 July 2021 diff hist 0 m Hozui-maru (1856) LordAmeth moved page Hozui-maru to Hozui-maru (1856): disamibg current
- 23:40, 17 July 2021 diff hist +361 Sakishima Islands
- 17:30, 9 July 2021 diff hist +361 Magiri current
- 18:15, 27 June 2021 diff hist +130 Kanjo bugyo →Selected Kanjô Bugyô current
- 14:49, 21 June 2021 diff hist +479 N Shurei no hikari Created page with "*''Japanese'': 守礼の光 ''(Shurei no hikari)'' ''Shurei no hikari'' was a magazine published by the Office of the High Commissioner in Okinawa_prefecture#Occupation|occ..." current
- 12:49, 21 June 2021 diff hist +278 Sogen-ji current
- 12:40, 21 June 2021 diff hist +803 Ryukyu Cultural Survey current
- 12:33, 21 June 2021 diff hist +303 George H. Kerr current
- 11:58, 21 June 2021 diff hist +4 George H. Kerr
- 11:57, 21 June 2021 diff hist +802 George H. Kerr
- 14:29, 19 June 2021 diff hist +884 N Nishikikoji Yoritomi Created page with "*''Died: 1864/4/25'' *''Titles: Uma no kami'' *''Other Names'': 翠園 ''(Suien)'' *''Japanese'': 錦小路 頼徳 ''(Nishikikouji Yoritomi)'' Nishikikôji Yoritomi w..." current
- 14:12, 19 June 2021 diff hist 0 Fall of Seven Nobles Incident current Tag: Visual edit: Switched
- 10:44, 14 June 2021 diff hist +325 N Tsuda Masamichi Created page with " Tsuda Masamichi was a Tokugawa shogunate retainer who served as Hakodate bugyô and, beginning on 1860/12/13, concurrently as ''Gaikoku bugyo|Gai..." current
- 10:42, 14 June 2021 diff hist +102 Nonoyama Kanehiro current
- 10:41, 14 June 2021 diff hist +62 Gaikoku bugyo →Selected List of Gaikoku bugyô
- 14:58, 13 June 2021 diff hist +415 N 仲宗根 (Nakasone) create kanji page current
- 14:55, 13 June 2021 diff hist +5 Nakasone Shozan current
- 14:53, 13 June 2021 diff hist +34 N 仲宗根 create redirect current Tag: New redirect
- 14:53, 13 June 2021 diff hist +1 Nakasone Toyomiya current
- 14:52, 13 June 2021 diff hist +4 Nakasone Toyomiya
- 14:51, 13 June 2021 diff hist +59 Harry Seisho Nakasone current
- 14:47, 13 June 2021 diff hist +1,927 N Harry Seisho Nakasone Created page with "*''Born: 1912'' *''Died: 2011'' Harry Seishô Nakasone was the long-time head of the Hawaiʻi branch of the Nomura-ryû school (style) of classical Okinawa..."
- 14:32, 13 June 2021 diff hist +26 Nomura-ryu current
- 14:32, 13 June 2021 diff hist +26 Order of the Rising Sun current
- 02:34, 13 June 2021 diff hist +1,704 N Majikina Yuko Created page with "*''Born: 1889/10/8, Naha'' *''Died: 1982/2/2'' *''Japanese'': 真境名 由康 ''(Majikina Yuukou)'' Majikina Yûkô was a master of classical Ryukyuan dance,..." current
- 02:17, 13 June 2021 diff hist -2 Nomura-ryu
- 02:04, 13 June 2021 diff hist +18 Sanshin-uchi current Tag: Visual edit: Switched
- 00:50, 13 June 2021 diff hist +87 Okinawans in Hawaii okina
- 00:47, 13 June 2021 diff hist +285 Okinawans in Hawaii →Today
- 11:48, 12 June 2021 diff hist +372 N Takai Dochi Created page with "*''Japanese'': 高井 道致 ''(Takai Douchi)'' Takai Dôchi was a Tokugawa shogunate retainer who served as ''Gaikoku bugyô'' beginning in [[1860]..." current
- 11:46, 12 June 2021 diff hist +376 N Takigawa Guchi Created page with "*''Japanese'': 滝川 具知 ''(Takigawa Guchi)'' Takigawa Guchi was a Tokugawa shogunate retainer who served as ''Gaikoku bugyô'' beginning in 1..." current
- 11:43, 12 June 2021 diff hist +55 Gaikoku bugyo →Selected List of Gaikoku bugyô
- 11:41, 12 June 2021 diff hist -2 James Hope Grant current
- 11:41, 12 June 2021 diff hist +374 N James Hope Grant Created page with " Sir James Hope Grant was commander of the British forces in China and Hong Kong c. 1860. Alongside Rutherford Alcock, he met with ''Rôjû'' Ando Nobuyuki..."
- 11:37, 12 June 2021 diff hist +176 Wakisaka Yasuori current Tag: Visual edit: Switched
- 11:35, 12 June 2021 diff hist +369 N Oguri Tadayoshi Created page with " Oguri Tadayoshi was a Tokugawa shogunate retainer who served as metsuke and, beginning in 1860, as ''gaikoku bugyô''. He was appointed to the..." current
- 11:33, 12 June 2021 diff hist +30 Gaikoku bugyo →Selected List of Gaikoku bugyô
- 11:32, 12 June 2021 diff hist +80 Hori Toshitada current Tag: Visual edit: Switched
- 11:30, 12 June 2021 diff hist +504 N Ogasawara Tadayoshi Created page with "*''Other Names'': 貞幹 ''(Sadayoshi)'' *''Japanese'': 小笠原 忠幹 ''(Ogasawara Tadayoshi)'' Ogasawara Tadayoshi was a Bakumatsu era lord of Anji han|Anji dom..." current
- 11:23, 12 June 2021 diff hist +19 Ogasawara Tadahiro current Tag: Visual edit: Switched
- 05:34, 25 October 2020 diff hist -817 Ba Kokusho create redirect current
- 05:13, 25 October 2020 diff hist +843 N Ba Kokusho Created page with "*''Titles'': 小禄里之子 ''(Uruku satunushi / Oroku satonushi)'' *''Japanese/Chinese'': 馬 克承 ''(Ba Kokushô / Mǎ Kèchéng)'' Ba Kokushô was a [[Ryukyu Kingdo..."
- 02:23, 7 October 2020 diff hist +44 Sasu Iori current
- 21:30, 17 September 2020 diff hist 0 Ryukyu investiture crown
- 01:12, 15 September 2020 diff hist 0 Ota Sukemoto current
- 07:46, 13 September 2020 diff hist +170 1872 →Timeline of 1872 current
- 07:05, 13 September 2020 diff hist +78 1870 →Timeline of 1870 current
- 07:03, 13 September 2020 diff hist +75 1872 →Timeline of 1872
- 03:17, 13 September 2020 diff hist +215 Uesugi Mochinori current