Search results
From SamuraiWiki
Jump to navigationJump to search
- ...s the 16th [[Prime Minister]] of Japan, serving another term as 22nd Prime Minister. ...he [[1868]] [[Boshin War]]. He served for a time as [[Ministry of the Navy|Minister of the Navy]], and in that position promoted Admiral [[Togo Heihachiro|Tôg882 bytes (118 words) - 10:57, 4 April 2017
- Aranpô was the first "prime minister" (国相) of the Okinawan kingdom of [[Chuzan|Chûzan]], serving under King ...a that same year, once again, this time in his official capacity as "prime minister."968 bytes (137 words) - 17:17, 29 August 2016
- ...Hatoyama Iichirô]]. His grandsons Yukio and Kunio also served in top-level minister positions.547 bytes (72 words) - 09:05, 9 April 2020
- ...ng Mào]], by taking on some of the responsibilities of the office of prime minister.685 bytes (106 words) - 02:33, 1 February 2020
- Kuroda Kiyotaka was the 2nd [[Prime Minister]] of Japan, and before that, director of the [[Hokkaido Development Bureau] ...Kuroda succeeded [[Ito Hirobumi|Itô Hirobumi]] to become the second Prime Minister of the Empire of Japan; he would serve in that position for only about a ye2 KB (301 words) - 04:38, 14 January 2020
- ...], Director-General of Mitsui [[kazoku|Baron]] [[Dan Takuma]], and [[Prime Minister]] [[Inukai Tsuyoshi]], all in 1932.735 bytes (91 words) - 14:32, 15 October 2017
- ...o|Tokyo's]] [[Shinbashi]] district, and later became a mistress of [[Prime Minister]] [[Katsura Taro|Katsura Tarô]].597 bytes (64 words) - 13:59, 20 January 2014
- ...time, [[Cheng Fu]], took on some responsibilities of the position of prime minister to help lighten Wang's load of administrative duties.<ref name=smits112/>1 KB (231 words) - 02:29, 1 February 2020
- ...griculture]] and later [[Naimusho|Minister of the Interior]] under [[Prime Minister]] [[Katsura Taro|Katsura Tarô]]. He was also a member of the [[Iwakura Mis ...ral cooperatives. During Katsura's second administration, Hirata was named Minister of the Interior in [[1908]]. He helped develop the [[Imperial Rescript of 14 KB (623 words) - 03:35, 26 November 2019
- Yi Yuwon was a Korean scholar-official who served as prime minister under [[Emperor Gojong]] of the [[Korean Empire]]. Yi is also known as a no564 bytes (75 words) - 03:36, 16 March 2018
- ...kyu Kingdom]], which handed down directives from the ''[[sessei]]'' (prime minister / regent) and ''[[Sanshikan]]'' (Council of Three).575 bytes (79 words) - 21:29, 30 January 2016
- ...t|Meiji state]]. The last of the surviving ''genrô'', he served as [[Prime Minister]] twice.503 bytes (66 words) - 10:30, 17 July 2020
- ...f Finance|Minister of Finance]] and [[Ministry of Agriculture and Commerce|Minister of Agriculture and Commerce]]. ...ster]] [[Konoe Fumimaro]], serving concurrently as Minister of Finance and Minister of Agriculture and Commerce. Three years later, he was named a member of th2 KB (268 words) - 02:10, 7 January 2017
- Should we stick to using terms such as "Prime Minister" which are only rough translations, or should we call the offices by their ...ce 'Dajodaijin'. In this case, I think it is apt--Dajodaijin is the prime minister, in that he is the first of the ministers of state. The next three are the6 KB (941 words) - 16:19, 9 December 2007
- ...ô, or Yà Lánpáo, was a Chinese-born official who served as the first prime minister (''ôsô'' or ''kokusô'') of the Okinawan kingdom of [[Chuzan|Chûzan]]. H525 bytes (80 words) - 02:29, 1 February 2020
- ...ng, [[judo]], and horseback riding. She later became a mistress to [[Prime Minister]] [[Ito Hirobumi|Itô Hirobumi]], before marrying actor & theatre troupe le768 bytes (87 words) - 13:50, 20 January 2014
- ...d of the Local Affairs Bureau of the [[Home Ministry]], and then Vice Home Minister, before becoming head of the Railways Department. He was elected to the [[House of Representatives]] in 1914, and then became Minister of Home Affairs for a time. He helped found the Seiyûhon-tô political par2 KB (247 words) - 09:20, 23 September 2016
- ...Kunio]] and [[Hatoyama Yukio]] all served as cabinet ministers or [[prime minister]]s.737 bytes (94 words) - 08:57, 9 April 2020
- Yamagata Aritomo was a [[Meiji period]] statesman, serving as [[Prime Minister]] for several terms, and playing a prominent role in a number of significan In the early 1870s, Aritomo served as Vice Minister of Military Affairs, and was among the chief figures advocating for [[milit2 KB (353 words) - 16:52, 13 October 2017
- ...ce Asaka. The building was later used as an official residence for [[Prime Minister]]s and as an official state guesthouse before being turned over to become a665 bytes (96 words) - 20:53, 25 May 2017